Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0890716

EP0890716 - Method of operating an internal combustion engine with monitoring of the activity of the catalytic converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 611, Park Lane Towers, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn
Michigan 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc. Suite 611, Parklane Towers East
One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 611, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mayer, Thomas E.
Grüngürtelstrasse 10
50996 Köln / DE
02 / Grieser, Klemens
Seidenweberstrasse 46
40764 Langenfeld / DE
[1999/02]
Representative(s)Bonsmann, Manfred
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/02]Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
Application number, filing date98111674.225.06.1998
[1999/02]
Priority number, dateDE199712908708.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19729087
[1999/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0890716
Date:13.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0890716
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0890716
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F01N7/00, F01N9/00, F02D41/02
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/02]F01N7/00, F01N9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1999/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Verbrennungsmotors mit Überwachung der Katalysatoraktivität[1999/02]
English:Method of operating an internal combustion engine with monitoring of the activity of the catalytic converter[1999/02]
French:Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne avec surveillance de l' activité du catalyseur[1999/02]
Examination procedure13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
13.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2001Fee for grant paid
19.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5577383  (KURODA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * column 1, line 13 - column 1, line 21; figures 1,5; claim 6 * * column 4, line 29 - column 4, line 43 * [Y] 1,9;
 [X]US5207058  (SASAKI SHIZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0725211  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US3949551  (EICHLER DIETER, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 31; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US5642705  (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 23; figure 5 *;
 [Y]EP0499207  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5050551  (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9116529  (VOLVO AB [SE]) [Y] 1,6,9 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]US4574588  (HAYAMA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [X]US5390491  (SUZUMURA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0719937  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract *