Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898108

EP0898108 - Connector assembly and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/08]Quick-connect assembly and method of manufacture
[2003/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dana Technology Inc.
30600 Telegraph Road
Bingham Farms, MI 48025 / US
[2002/50]
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
ECHLIN INC.
100 Double Beach Road
Branford, CT 06405 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAYLOR, Brian
1072 Woodside Trail
Troy, MI 48098 / US
[1999/08]
Representative(s)Wehnert, Werner , et al
Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/08]Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons , et al
Mozartstrasse 23
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111742.725.06.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateUS1997091693421.08.1997         Original published format: US 916934
[1999/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898108
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898108
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898108
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16L33/22, F16L47/00, F16L13/16, F16L37/088
[2001/09]
Former International [1999/08]F16L33/22, F16L47/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/46]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schnellkupplungsanordnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung[1999/08]
English:Connector assembly and method of manufacture[2003/36]
French:Connecteur rapide et procédé de fabrication[2003/36]
Former [1999/08]Quick-connect assembly and method of manufacture
Former [1999/08]Assemblage à fixation rapide et procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure28.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/43]
06.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2004Fee for grant paid
08.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
IT17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2006/13]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US4702543  (HAGER JEFFREY J [US]) [A] 1,8,12 * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0615089  (TECALEMIT GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 1,8,12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0661491  (DAYCO EUROPE SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8,12 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *