blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0887030 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0887030



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
07.05.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.08.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
07.01.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.01.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 15
18.11.1998 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.06.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
26.06.1998 Description Search / examination 8
26.06.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 4
26.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 17
26.06.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6