blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0887030


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
07.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
11.10.2002 Examination report or reply
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
17.05.2002 First examination report
15.05.2002 Examination report or reply
07.07.2001 Renewal fee
27.12.2000 Change - extension states
27.10.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  13.12.2000 [2000/50]
07.07.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication of search report published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
13.11.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.12.1998 [1998/53]
13.11.1998 Request for examination filed published on  30.12.1998 [1998/53]