Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0887030

EP0887030 - Arm rest for seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ikeda Bussan Co., Ltd.
No. 771, Kozono Ayase-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Ikeda Bussan Co., Ltd.
No. 771, Kozono
Ayase-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hoshino, Akihiko
3-4-8, Sakurayama
Zushi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98111876.326.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateJP1997018768627.06.1997         Original published format: JP 18768697
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0887030
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0887030
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C7/54, B60N2/46
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/50]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Armstütze für Sitze[1999/01]
English:Arm rest for seat[1999/01]
French:Appuie-bras pour sièges[1999/01]
Examination procedure26.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/26]
10.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5131721  (OKAMOTO HIKONORI [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [YA]WO9710117  (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3;
 [A]FR2224322  (LEMAIRE FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 4; figures PL2,1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [E]JPH10295490
 [E]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10295490 A 19981110 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO LTD) [E] 1-3 * abstract *