Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0889302

EP0889302 - Bicycle display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Shimano Inc.
77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kishimoto, Hitoshi
2-3, Goryotori
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner
Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date98112083.530.06.1998
[1999/01]
Priority number, dateJP1997019199702.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19199797
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0889302
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0889302
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0889302
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01C22/00, B62J39/00
[2000/16]
Former International [1999/01]G01C22/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/52]
Former [1999/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrradanzeigevorrichtung[1999/01]
English:Bicycle display device[1999/01]
French:Dispositif d' affichage pour bicyclette[1999/01]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
20.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, PT, SE
26.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC
06.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2002Fee for grant paid
16.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DY]US4071892  (GENZLING CLAUDE) [DY] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4393796  (DUNN WILLIAM H, et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 43 *;
 [A]EP0318461  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
by applicantUS4071892