Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0915276

EP0915276 - Austenitic stainless steel valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aska Corporation
458-1, Minosho-cho Yamatokohriyama-shi
Nara / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
Aska Corporation
458-1, Minosho-cho
Yamatokohriyama-shi, Nara / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kaneshige, Noritsugu
c/o Aska Corporation, 458-1, Minosho-cho
Yamatokohriyama-shi, Nara / JP
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Schieschke, Klaus , et al
Patentanwälte
Eder & Schieschke
Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Former [1999/19]Eder, Eugen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date98112281.502.07.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateJP1997030587407.11.1997         Original published format: JP 30587497
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0915276
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0915276
Date:14.07.1999
[1999/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0915276
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0915276
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16K27/02, F16K1/10
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/41]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Austenitisches, rostfreies Stahlventil[1999/19]
English:Austenitic stainless steel valve[1999/19]
French:Soupape d'acier inoxydable austenitique[1999/19]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
13.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2002Fee for grant paid
29.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4284263  (NEWCOMB CLIVE V) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 68; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4229730  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4585210  (ADAMS DONALD L [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 17 *