Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969271

EP0969271 - Weighing of hydraulically movable components with new calibration according to raised oil temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]Weighing method for hydraulically moveable components
[2000/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfreundt GmbH & Co. KG
Ramsdorfer Strasse 10
46354 Südlohn / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Wissing, Ludger
Westfalenring 41
48712 Gescher / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Habbel, Ludwig
Habbel & Habbel
Patentanwälte
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Habbel, Ludwig (Lutz), Dipl.-Ing.
Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date98112375.504.07.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969271
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969271
Date:17.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01G19/10, G01G23/48, G01G23/01
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wägen von hydraulisch bewegten Bauteilen mit erneuter Kalibrierung bei erhöhter Öltemperatur[2000/37]
English:Weighing of hydraulically movable components with new calibration according to raised oil temperature[2000/37]
French:Pesage d' éléments dans un mouvement hydraulique avec recalibrage lorsque la temperature de l'huile est elevée[2000/38]
Former [2000/01]"Verfahren zum Wiegen von hydraulisch bewegten Bauteilen"
Former [2000/01]Weighing method for hydraulically moveable components
Former [2000/01]Procédé pour peser des éléments mobiles hydrauliquement
Examination procedure13.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
29.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2001Fee for grant paid
09.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19534058  (SARTORIUS GMBH) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 14; figure 2 *;
 [YD]WO9616383  (ATLAS COPCO WAGNER INC) [YD] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3639521  (SARTORIUS GMBH) [A] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 11; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5058422  (SHIMAUCHI KUNIO) [A] 1 * column 4, line 9 - line 43; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5666295  (BRUNS ROBERT W) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - line 51 *;
 [A]SU580460  (LENINGRADSKIJ [SU]) [A] 1 * abstract *