EP0884617 - Scanning near-field optic/atomic-force microscope, probe for use in same, and method of fabricating said probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramatsu, Hiroshi c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Chiba, Norio c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ataka, Tatsuaki c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Fujihira, Masamichi 2000-10-3-104 Kosugaya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/07] | 01 /
Matsumura, Hiroshi c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Chiba, Norio c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ataka, Tatsuaki c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Fujihira, Masamichi 2000-10-3-104 Kosugaya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [1999/02] | 01 /
Matsumura, Hiroshi c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Chiba, Norio c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ataka, Tatsuaki c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Fujihira, Masamichi c/o Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1998/51] | 01 /
Matsumura, Hiroshi c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Chiba, Norio c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ataka, Tatsuaki c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Fujihira, Masamichi c/0 Seiko Instruments Inc., 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [2008/35] |
Former [2002/04] | Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | Fischer, Matthias, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112393.8 | 06.04.1994 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19930084952 | 12.04.1993 Original published format: JP 8495293 | JP19930276704 | 05.11.1993 Original published format: JP 27670493 | JP19930276706 | 05.11.1993 Original published format: JP 27670693 | JP19940052248 | 23.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5224894 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884617 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884617 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G01B7/34 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
G01Q30/02 (EP,KR,US);
G01Q60/22 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (KR);
B82Y35/00 (KR);
G01Q60/06 (EP,KR,US);
G01Q60/38 (EP,KR,US);
G01Q70/02 (EP,US);
G02B6/241 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S977/862 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/51] | Title | German: | Kombinierte Nahfeld- und Atomkraftrastermikroskop, Sonde dafür und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Sonde | [1998/51] | English: | Scanning near-field optic/atomic-force microscope, probe for use in same, and method of fabricating said probe | [1998/51] | French: | Microscope de balayage optique de champ proche/à force atomique combiné, sonde employée dans un tel système, et procédé de fabrication de ladite sonde | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94105337.3 / EP0622652 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.1999 | 30.04.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 04.09.2002 | IT | 04.09.2002 | LI | 04.09.2002 | NL | 04.09.2002 | GB | 06.04.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/22] | CH | 04.09.2002 | |
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
GB | 06.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 04.09.2002 | |
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
NL | 04.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 04.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0535611 (FUJIHIRA MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,12 * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 49; figures 1A,5; example 4 * [A] 7 [Y] 4,8,9; | [PX]EP0545538 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [PX] 1,5,7,8 * column 7, line 34 - column 9, line 36; figures 5-7,9-11,13; example . * | [XAY] - SHALOM S ET AL, "A micropipette force probe suitable for near-field scanning optical microscopy", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, SEPT. 1992, USA, VOL. 63, NR. 9, PAGES 4061 - 4065, ISSN 0034-6748, XP000311659 [X] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1,10,11 [Y] 4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1143212 | [A] - LEWIS A ET AL, "The optical near field and analytical chemistry", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, JUN. 1991, USA, VOL. 63, NR.11, PAGES 625A - 638A, ISSN 0003-2700, XP000226379 [A] 1,7,8 * page 630A, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00006a014 |