Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972949

EP0972949 - A pneumatic pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDR HOLDING S.A.
23, Avenue Monterey
2086 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
IDR HOLDING S.A.
NO. 23, Avenue Monterey
2086 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / Almasio, Vittorio
No. 2/C, Via Roggia Renatella
20063 Cernusco sul Naviglio (MI) / IT
02 / Ramponi, Sandro
No. 68/A, Via Zola
Localita Porotto, 44100 Ferrara (FE) / IT
03 / Vincenzi, Lamberto
No. 33, Via Chiesa di Staggia
41030 S. Prospero sulla Secchia (MO) / IT
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A.
Via M. Vellani, 20
41124 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Gotra, Stefano
BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date98112605.508.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972949
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972949
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F15B21/12
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein pneumatischer Impulsgenerator[2000/03]
English:A pneumatic pulse generator[2000/03]
French:Un générateur pneumatique d'impulsions[2000/03]
Examination procedure07.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
18.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2002Fee for grant paid
28.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2852294  (WABCO FAHRZEUGBREMSEN) [X] 1,3,5 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2; figure . * [Y] 2;
 [Y]DE2202804  (SAMSON APPARATEBAU) [Y] 2 * page 6, paragraph 5; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE1260252  (SOCIETE D'ELECTRO-CHIMIE) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 26 - line 33 * * column 3, line 51 - line 55 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]GB1251610  (TEMPLE INSTRUMENTS) [A] 3 * page 2, line 87 - line 93; figure . *