Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0909672

EP0909672 - Arrangement of a component, particularly of a control unit, on a dashboard of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/16]Arrangement for attachment of a component, particularly of a control unit, on a dashboard of a motor vehicle
[2000/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Preh-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
An der Stadthalle
97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE
[2001/22]
Former [1999/16]For all designated states
Preh-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
An der Stadthalle
97616 Bad Neustadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Karl-Heinz
Lerchenstrasse 9
97616 Bad Neustadt / DE
02 / Voll, Walter
Lindenstrasse 68a
97657 Sandberg / DE
[1999/16]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara , et al
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2009/48]
Former [2000/43]Dietrich, Barbara , et al
Rheinmetall AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 10 42 61
40033 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/41]Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Rheinmetall Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/16]Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98112625.308.07.1998
[1999/16]
Priority number, dateDE199714547315.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19745473
[1999/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0909672
Date:21.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0909672
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0909672
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K37/04
[1999/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [1999/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordung eines Bauteils, insbesondere eines Bedienteils,auf einem Armaturenbrett eines Kraftfahrzeuges[2000/43]
English:Arrangement of a component, particularly of a control unit, on a dashboard of a motor vehicle[2000/43]
French:Agencement d'un élément en particulier d'un ensemble de commande sur le tableau de bord d'une automobile[2000/43]
Former [1999/16]Anordung zur Befestigung eines Bauteils, insbesondere eines Bedienteils,auf einem Armaturenbrett eines Kraftfahrzeuges
Former [1999/16]Arrangement for attachment of a component, particularly of a control unit, on a dashboard of a motor vehicle
Former [1999/16]Agencement de fixation d'un élément en particulier d'un ensemble de commande sur le tableau de bord d'une automobile
Examination procedure07.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
15.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2000Fee for grant paid
05.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE4326910  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2720125  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 32 * * page 6, line 19 - line 27 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5639140  (LABRASH CARL LEROY [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE1630874
 DE4326910
 DE6607987U