Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978283

EP0978283 - Manufacture of an agent inhibiting transplant rejection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Werner, Ernst
Hechenbergweg 10
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[2000/34]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Ernst, Werner
Hechenbergweg 10
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2002/27]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Steinsdorfstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Hofinger, Engelbert, Dr.Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Application number, filing date98112821.810.07.1998
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978283
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978283
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/505
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung eines die Transplantatabstossung unterdrückenden Mittels[2000/06]
English:Manufacture of an agent inhibiting transplant rejection[2000/06]
French:Préparation d'un agent destiné a prévenir le rejet des greffes[2000/06]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
09.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2002Fee for grant paid
05.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE4418097  (CASSELLA AG [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * column W *
 [X]  - S. PFEIFFER ET AL., "Allosteric and functional effects of the potent pterin antagonist of neuronal nitric oxide synthase 4-amino-tetrahydrobiopterin", PORTLAND PRESS PROC., (1998), vol. 15, no. Biology of Nitric Oxide, Part 6, page 15, XP002088812 [X] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - E.R.WERNER ET AL., "Identification of the 4-amino analogue of tetrahydrobiopterin as a dihydropteridine reductase inhibitor and a potent pteridine antagonist of rat neuronal nitric oxide synthase", BIOCHEM.J., (1996), vol. 320, no. 1, pages 193 - 196, XP002088813 [XD] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [X]  - B.MAYER ET AL., "Tetrahydrobiopterin Binding to Macrophage Inducible Nitric Oxide Synthase: Heme Spin Shift and Dimer Stabilization by the Potent Pterin Antagonist 4-Amino-Tetrahydrobiopterin", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 27, pages 8422 - 8427, XP002088814 [X] 1-3 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi970144z
 [X]  - S. PFEIFFER ET AL., "Allosteric modulation of rat brain nitric oxide synthase by the pterin-site enzyme inhibitor 4-aminotetrahydrobiopterin", BIOCHEM.J., (1997), vol. 328, no. 2, pages 349 - 352, XP002088815 [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [X]  - E.R.WERNER ET AL., "Binding of pteridines to nitric oxide synthase. Clues for the mechanism of stimulation of nitric oxide synthase by tetrahydrobiopterin", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980629), vol. 128, no. 26, Database accession no. 318679e, XP002088816 [X] 1-3 * abstract *
    [] - CHEM.BIOL.PTERIDINES FOLATES 1997, PROC. INT. SYMP. PTERIDINES FOLATES, (1997), pages 669 - 673,
Examination   - WORALL N.K. ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (19970427), vol. 63, no. 8, pages 1095 - 1101,
    - BRANDACHER, G. ET AL., "The 4-Amino Analogue of Tetrahydrobiopterin Efficiently Prolongs Murine Cardiac-Allograft Survival", THE JOURNAL OF HEART AND LUNG TRANSPLANTATION, (200103), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 1 - 3,