Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971283

EP0971283 - A notebook computer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lin, Hui
7F., No. 76, Chung Shiao E. Rd.
Taipei / TW
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2000/02]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98112881.210.07.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971283
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971283
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT 
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rechner des Note-book Typs[2000/02]
English:A notebook computer[2000/02]
French:Ordinateur du type notebook[2000/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
14.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2004Fee for grant paid
02.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.08.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
ES17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
IT17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
LU10.07.2004
IE12.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
PT17.08.2004
[2008/12]
Former [2007/17]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
ES17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
LU10.07.2004
IE12.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2006/13]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
LU10.07.2004
IE12.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/24]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
LU10.07.2004
IE12.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
LU10.07.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/22]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
MC31.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH06161703  ;
 [XA]JPH01131913  ;
 [A]US5333116  (HAWKINS JEFF C [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 23 *;
 [A]JPH10143086  ;
 [A]JPH0728556
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940908), vol. 018, no. 484, Database accession no. (P - 1798), [X] 6,7,9 * abstract * [A] 1
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890822), vol. 013, no. 377, Database accession no. (P - 922), [X] 6-8 * abstract * [A] 1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 098, no. 010, [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, [A] 5 * abstract *