Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973312

EP0973312 - Method and device for the simultaneous translation of telephone conversations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stöffler, Matthias
Robert-Schumann-Strasse 3
71083 Herrenberg / DE
For all designated states
Reitz, Oliver
Eiserne Hand 11
35305 Grünberg / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Klocke, Peter
ABACUS
Patentanwälte
Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21
72202 Nagold / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Klocke - Späth - Neubauer Patentanwälte, Kappelstrasse 8
72160 Horb / DE
Application number, filing date98112934.911.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973312
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04M3/56, H04M15/00
[2000/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Simultanübersetzung von Telefongesprächen[2000/03]
English:Method and device for the simultaneous translation of telephone conversations[2000/03]
French:Méthode et appareil de traduction simultanée de conversations téléphoniques[2000/03]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
22.07.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/16]
16.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0601710  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5631904  (FITSER MARK A [US], et al) [A] * column 5, line 27 - line 53 *;
 [A]EP0440515  (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]);
 [A]JPS6024755  ;
 [A]JPS6282853  ;
 [A]EP0311416  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [A]EP0585480  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [A]  - HASSLER K W ET AL, "REVOLUTIONIZING DEFINITY CALL CENTERS IN THE 1990S", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19950701), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 64 - 73, XP000517580 [A] * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850618), vol. 009, no. 143, Database accession no. (E - 322), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870912), vol. 011, no. 284, Database accession no. (E - 540), [A] * abstract *