Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972921

EP0972921 - Internal combustion piston engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konotech s.r.o.
Na Vysoké II 319
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Perewusnyk, Josef
Ahornstrasse 17
5442 Fislisbach / CH
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date98113041.214.07.1998
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972921
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02B77/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine[2000/03]
English:Internal combustion piston engine[2000/03]
French:Moteur à piston à combustion interne[2000/03]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/20]
01.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]CH509505  (BRIGGS) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-15 * [A] 2-4,7;
 [YA]US3102515  (SCHWERDT) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 22 - line 52 * [A] 8;
 [A]DE9010077U  (ALCAN) [A] 1,2,7 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]DE19530914  (HOESL JOSEF) [A] 1,2,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4317254  (HOESL JOSEF) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE425082  (LEICHTMETALLWERKE) [A] 1,5 * figure W *;
 [A]FR992440  (ALLIANCE EUROPÉENNE) [A] 1,7,8 * figure 1 * * abstract *
by applicantUS5404639