Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0891820

EP0891820 - Pneumatic separator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANN + HUMMEL ProTec GmbH
Grönerstrasse 44-50
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Mann + Hummel ProTec GmbH
Grönerstrasse 44-50
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Poller, Stephan
Albrechtsrasse 3
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
02 / Belsser, Anton-Herbert
Sudetenstrasse 5
71679 Asperg / DE
03 / Weigel, Viktor
Ahornweg 16
71679 Asperg / DE
[1999/03]
Representative(s)Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [1999/03]Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
Application number, filing date98113124.615.07.1998
[1999/03]
Priority number, dateDE199713037116.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19730371
[1999/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0891820
Date:20.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0891820
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B07B4/04, B07B11/00
[1999/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Windsichter[1999/03]
English:Pneumatic separator[1999/03]
French:Séparateur pneumatique[1999/03]
Examination procedure21.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
13.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/27]
31.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]BE648363  (POLYSIUS) [X] 1-3,7 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 17 * * figure . *;
 [X]DE3713435  (NAGEMA VEB K [DD]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 42 * * figure - *;
 [X]DE3540682  (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * claim - * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0583924  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 5 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE2853694  (KOCKS GMBH FRIEDRICH) [A] 6 * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *