Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911596

EP0911596 - Tube-like radiator with lower connection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. VASCO
Kruishoefstraat 50
3650 Dilsen-Stokkem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
N.V. VASCO
Kruishoefstraat 50
B-3650 Dilsen-Stokkem / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Vaessen, Jos
1-Meilaan 12
3650 Dilsen Stakkem / BE
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Haber, Jan Wilhelm
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Schrooten Haber
Mörsenbroicher Weg 200
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]Haber, Jan Wilhelm
Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Schrooten Haber Mörsenbroicher Weg 200
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/17]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98113260.816.07.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateDE199714727425.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19747274
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911596
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911596
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F28D1/04, F28F9/26
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Röhrenheizkörper mit unterem Anschluss[1999/17]
English:Tube-like radiator with lower connection[1999/17]
French:Radiateur avec connection inférieure[1999/17]
Examination procedure21.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
10.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]CH673523  (AGIS SPA) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7,9;
 [YA]DE19512364  (BERG HANS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 7 * figure -; claim 1 * [A] ;
 [Y]DE29504520U  (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure -; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]DE29618611U  (VOGEL & NOOT WAERMETECHNIK AG [AT]) [A] 1-9 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE4104078  (DIETRICH WALTER WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 23 - line 35; figures 1-3 *