Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975003

EP0975003 - Colour television or colour monitor with flat screen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Matsushita Display Devices (Germany) GmbH
Fritz-Müller-Strasse 112
73730 Esslingen / DE
[2001/50]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics (Europe) GmbH
Fritz-Müller-Strasse 112
73730 Esslingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mitrowitsch, Johann
Bergäcker 64
73669 Lichtenwald / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98113322.616.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975003
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975003
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J29/70
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Farbfernsehgerät oder Farbmonitor mit flachem Bildschirm[2000/04]
English:Colour television or colour monitor with flat screen[2000/04]
French:Téléviseur-couleur ou moniteur en couleur à écran plat[2000/04]
Examination procedure26.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2002Fee for grant paid
19.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2034108  (RCA CORP) [Y] 1,3,5,7,9,11 * page 1, line 103 - page 2, line 15 * * page 2, line 59 - line 71 *;
 [Y]WO9202033  (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,7,9,11 * page 1, paragraph 4 *;
 [Y]GB1449700  (BALANDIN G D, et al) [Y] 1,5,11 * page 2, line 68 - line 81 *;
 [A]US3761763  (SARUTA S) [A] 1 * figures 3,4,6,8 * * column 1, line 25 - line 34 * * column 2, line 24 - line 49 *;
 [A]GB2261546  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 14, paragraph 4 *
ExaminationWO9744808