Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975127

EP0975127 - Method for securing and restoring data from a telecommunication exchange and corresponding telecommunication exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Endres, Rüdiger
Boschetsrieder Strasse 63
81379 München / DE
02 / Lange, Alfred
Thorner Strasse 9
80993 München / DE
03 / Trumpfheller, Thomas
Hartstrasse 104
82110 Germering / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98113410.917.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975127
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04Q3/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting states[2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Sichern und Restaurieren von Daten einer Telekommunikationsanlage und entsprechende Telekommunikationsanlage[2000/04]
English:Method for securing and restoring data from a telecommunication exchange and corresponding telecommunication exchange[2000/04]
French:Procédure de secours et de restauration des données d'une centrale de télécommunication et centrale de telecommunication correspondante[2000/04]
Examination procedure18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
04.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/13]
06.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time  [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4656656  (MUNDY JR THOMAS C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 23 * * column 3, line 61 - line 66 * * column 4, line 3 - line 20 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0366341  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 21 * * page 2, column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 44 *