blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0975127


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.02.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
01.11.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
22.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
26.07.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]