blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0975127

Designated contracting states
Examination procedure06.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time  [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000218
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20001004