EP0898075 - An ignition switch having a positive off and automatic on [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALBRO CORPORATION 6242 Garfield Avenue Cass City, MI 48726 / US | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Martin N. 1660 Colwood Road Caro, Mi. 48723 / US | 02 /
Koziatek, Jason R. 825 S. Johnson Bay City, Mi. 48708 / US | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Wehnert, Werner Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113505.6 | 20.07.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | US19970914568 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: US 914568 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898075 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898075 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02P1/08 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
F02P11/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (EP,US);
F02P11/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2000/38] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zündschalter mit Ausschaltposition und automatischer Einschaltposition | [1999/08] | English: | An ignition switch having a positive off and automatic on | [1999/08] | French: | Commutateur d'allumage avec position d'arrêt et position de mise en marche automatique | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3863616 (WOOD DONALD H) [A] 1-3 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]US3960128 (ANDERSON HAROLD E, et al) [A] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US4073279 (FOX WAYNE S) [X] 1-3,7,9 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 47 * * figure 2 * [A] 4,5,8,10; | [X]US4193385 (FUJITA TOMIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 33 * * column 9, line 40 - line 53 * * column 12, line 3 - line 7 * * figures 3,19 * |