EP0897212 - Series motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. & E. Fein GmbH Hans-Fein-Strasse 81 73529 Schwäbisch-Gmünd-Bargau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states C. & E. Fein GmbH Hans-Fein-Strasse 81 73529 Schwäbisch-Gmünd-Bargau / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states C. & E. FEIN GmbH Leuschnerstrasse 43 70176 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states C. & E. Fein Gmbh & Co. KG Leuschnerstrasse 41-47 70176 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states C. & E. FEIN GmbH & Co. Leuschnerstrasse 41-47 D-70176 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Christoph Sauerampferweg 18 70599 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113613.8 | 21.07.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | DE1997134958 | 13.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19734958 | [1999/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897212 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897212 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897212 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K23/24, H02K23/42 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
H02K23/24 (EP,US);
H02K23/42 (EP,US);
H02K7/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/03] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reihenschlussmotor | [1999/07] | English: | Series motor | [1999/07] | French: | Moteur série | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3929556 (ROTTMERHUSEN HANS HERMANN [DE]) [A] * column 5, line 8 - line 26 * * figure 8 *; | [A]EP0029462 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] * page 6, line 20 - line 24 * * page 8, line 21 - line 30 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US4616150 (CONCANNON BRIAN T [US]) [A] * column 3, line 21 - line 28 * * figures 2,3 * |