Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974326

EP0974326 - Diaper Closure system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Loescher, Claus
Deutzer Str. 66
41468 Neuss / DE
02 / Wilhelm, Stefan c/oMinnesota Mining&ManufacturinCo
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul Minnesota 55 144-1000 / US
 [2005/07]
Former [2000/04]01 / Loescher, Klaus c/oMinnesota Mining and Man. Comp.
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144-1000 / US
02 / Wilhelm, Stefan c/oMinnesota Mining&ManufacturinCo
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul Minnesota 55 144-1000 / US
Representative(s)Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual
Property Counsel
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [2000/04]Wilhelm, Stefan , et al
3M Laboratories (Europe) GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hansastrasse 9
41453 Neuss / DE
Application number, filing date98113867.024.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974326
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974326
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/58
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Windelverschlusssystem[2000/04]
English:Diaper Closure system[2000/04]
French:Système de fermeture de couche[2000/04]
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2004Fee for grant paid
17.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9728774  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 16, line 13 - page 18, line 35 * * page 28, line 15 - page 31, line 15; figure - *;
 [AD]US5605729  (MODY KIRIT C [US], et al) [AD] 1,7,8 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP0321232  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])
by applicantEP0324578
 EP0321232
 EP0529681
 US4036233
 EP0487758
 EP0780109