Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976823

EP0976823 - Recombinant expression system and high throughput BioAssay for the therapeutic use of calcineurine-A- alpha, calcineurine-A-beta, calcineurine-A-gamma, calcineurine-B und Cu/Zn-superoxide dismutase respectively for the identification of pharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2001 [2001/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Völkel, Helge, Dr.
Loherstrasse 18/1
89081 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Völkel, Helge, Dr.
Universität Ulm, Experimentelle Neurologie, Albert-Einstein-Allee 11
89081 Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/21]
Former [2000/05]01 / Völkel, Helge, Dr.
Universität Ulm, Experimentelle Neurtologie
Albert-Einstein-Allee 11, 89081 Ulm / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele
Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98113876.122.07.1998
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976823
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/53, C12N15/55, C12N15/62, C12N15/70, C12N15/85, C12N9/16, C12N9/02, C07K14/47, G01N33/50, A61K38/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rekombinantes Expressions System und Hoch-Durchsatz BioAssay für die therapeutische Anwendung von Calcineurin-A-Alpha, Calcineurin-A-Beta, Calcineurin-A-Gamma, Calcineurin-B und Copper/Zinc-Superoxide Dismutase bzw. zur Identifizierung von Pharmazeutika[2000/05]
English:Recombinant expression system and high throughput BioAssay for the therapeutic use of calcineurine-A- alpha, calcineurine-A-beta, calcineurine-A-gamma, calcineurine-B und Cu/Zn-superoxide dismutase respectively for the identification of pharmaceuticals[2000/05]
French:Système d'expression recombinante et essai biologique à grand débit pour l'utilisation thérapeutique de calcineurine-A-alpha, calcineurine-A-beta, calcineurine-A-gamma et Cu/Zn-superoxide dismutase respectivement pour l'identification des compositions pharmaceutiques[2000/05]
Examination procedure01.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/35]
08.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06181778  ;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 31, Database accession no. 94-251696, XP002098865 & JPH06181778 A 19940705 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - T. MURAMATSU AND R.L. KINCAID, "Molecular cloning of a full-length cDNA encoding the catalytic subunit of human calmodulin-dependent protein phosphatase (Calcineurin A alpha)", BIOCHIMICA BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), vol. 1178, pages 117 - 120, XP002098863 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4889(93)90117-8
 [X]  - R.L. KINCAID ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of molecular isoforms of the catalytic subunit of calcineurin using nonisotopic methods", J. BIOL. CHEM., AM. SOC. BIOCHEM. MOL.BIOL.,INC.,BALTIMORE,US, (19900705), vol. 265, no. 19, pages 11312 - 11319, XP002098864 [X] 1 * the whole document *