Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974372

EP0974372 - Sealing rubber closure for syringe/container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masamichi, Sudo, c/o Daikyo Seiko, Ltd.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Morihiro, Sudo, c/o Daikyo Seiko, Ltd.
38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hartz, Nikolai , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr. , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98113909.024.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974372
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974372
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/31
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abdichtender Gummiverschluss für Spritze / Behälter[2000/04]
English:Sealing rubber closure for syringe/container[2000/04]
French:Fermeture étanche en caoutchouc pour seringue / récipient[2000/04]
Examination procedure10.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
06.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2004Fee for grant paid
18.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5531710  (DANG NGUYEN T [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,2;
 [A]US4439184  (WHEELER ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 4 - line 51; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0685237  (NISSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 40; figures 1,5-8 *
by applicantJPH07212598
 JPH08280800
 EP0709105
 JPH08317975
 JPS62139668