Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974261

EP0974261 - Roundbale shredder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VöLK MASCHINENBAU GmbH
Rudolf-Diesel-Str. 5
D-86899 Landsberg / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Polykarp, Völk FA. Völk Maschinenbau GmbH
Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 5
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98113930.624.07.1998
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974261
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01F29/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rundballenhäcksler[2000/04]
English:Roundbale shredder[2000/04]
French:Hâcheuse de balles rondes[2000/04]
Examination proceduredeletedDespatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, FR, GB, IT
18.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE
01.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
05.07.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
23.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/42]
26.05.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2001
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2070401  (NICHOL W J, et al) [X] 1,3,5 * page 2, line 65 - page 3, line 62 * * page 4, line 11 - line 34 * * page 4, line 64 - line 90 * [A] 4;
 [A]US3035621  (BURCHAM HARRY L) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 35 - line 70 *;
 [A]US5671891  (KEENAN RICHARD [IE], et al);
 [A]FR2723288  (SAMAS [FR]);
 [A]FR2741777  (SERMAP [FR]);
 [A]EP0568961  (BISO MASCHF GMBH [DE]);
 [A]FR2586525  (CACQUEVEL BERNARD [FR])
by applicantFR2585535
 DE4216510