EP0976524 - Extruder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rutishauser, Stefan Wildeggstrasse 23 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2000/05] | Application number, filing date | 98113955.3 | 25.07.1998 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976524 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976524 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/08, B29C45/17, B29C47/58 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
B29C48/2561 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/41] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Extruder | [2000/05] | English: | Extruder | [2000/05] | French: | Extrudeuse | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2090434 (EMIL THALMANN) [DA] 1 * page 1, column 20 - column 51 *; | [A]DE1230553 (ECKERT & ZIEGLER GMBH) [A] 1* column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 25 *; | [Y]DE1268367 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 12 - line 32 * * figure 2 *; | [DY]WO9606721 (BUEHLER AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1,2,7,8 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 23 * | Examination | JPS60154026 |