Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0894466

EP0894466 - Hinge for plate glass doors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DORMA GmbH + Co. KG
Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48
58256 Ennepetal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
DORMA GmbH + Co. KG
Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48
D-58256 Ennepetal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Munch, Paul-Jean
629, Les Evaux
68910 Labaroche 1 / FR
[1999/05]
Application number, filing date98113993.427.07.1998
[1999/05]
Priority number, dateDE199713303731.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19733037
[1999/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0894466
Date:03.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0894466
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47K3/22, E05D5/02, E05D5/06
[1999/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/50]
Former [1999/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Band für rahmenlose Glastüren[1999/05]
English:Hinge for plate glass doors[1999/05]
French:Paumelle pour portes entièrement vitrées[1999/05]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
25.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2006Fee for grant paid
28.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
05.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/34]
Request for further processing for:19.03.2004Request for further processing filed
18.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4141109  (FARRELL THURLOW) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 42 - line 45 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 3; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,8;
 [Y]EP0495205  (MUNCH PAUL JEAN [FR]) [Y] 2 * column 8, line 43 - line 49; figures 6,7 *;
 [Y]FR2408711  (GUIDOTTI DANTE [FR]) [Y] 8 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *
by applicantDE9413972U