Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0908677

EP0908677 - Pipestill heater [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MG Technologies AG
Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2003/25]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
mg technologies ag
Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
Metallgesellschaft Aktiengesellschaft
Bockenheimer Landstrasse 73-77
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hohmann, Friedrich
Feldbergstrasse 30
63225 Langen / DE
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Revesz, Veronika
c/o Lurgi AG Abt. Patente, A-VRP Lurgiallee 5
60295 Frankfurt/Main / DE
[2001/18]
Application number, filing date98114059.328.07.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateDE199714488210.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19744882
[1999/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908677
Date:14.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908677
Date:17.11.1999
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0908677
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:F23L17/00, F23L17/16
[1999/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2000/30]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Röhrenofen[1999/15]
English:Pipestill heater[1999/15]
French:Four tubulaire[1999/15]
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YD]US3988425  (JOCKEL HEINZ, et al) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR1182497  (FONDERIE SOC GEN DE) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4604051  (DAVIES THEODORE E [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 13 - line 17; figure 2 *;
 [A]US1604271  (FRIEDMAN FERDINAND J) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3988425
 US4442020