Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899479

EP0899479 - Shifting device for an automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
No. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-city
Kanagawa-prefecture / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
No. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-city, Kanagawa-prefecture / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishii, Shigeru
6-20, Mizuhiki 2-chome
Atsugi city, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Sugiuchi, Masashi
9-23-106, Nakahara 1-chome
Hiratsuka city, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Fujioka, Mitsuru
1-6-301, Tsujidou-nishikaigan, 3-chome
Fujisawa city, Kanagawa / JP
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98114109.628.07.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateJP1997020329729.07.1997         Original published format: JP 20329797
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0899479
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0899479
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16H59/02, F16H61/12
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/46]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schalteinrichtung für ein automatisches Getriebe[2002/45]
English:Shifting device for an automatic transmission[1999/09]
French:Sélecteur de vitesse de transmission automatique[1999/09]
Former [1999/09]Schalteinrichtung für ein automatisches Gertiebe
Examination procedure28.07.1998Examination requested  [1999/09]
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2002Fee for grant paid
14.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3628642  (RAVENEL RAYMOND A) [A] 1-3 * column 5 - column 8, line 55; figures 1-3,12 *;
 [A]US5584209  (ISSA NABIL M [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 12; figures 1,2A,2B *;
 [A]US5425686  (GRANGE JEAN-PAUL [FR]) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 15 - column 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0403273  (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS4987792