EP0895776 - Cosmetic light-screening composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bringhen, Alain 221 route d'Annecy 1257 Croix-de-Rozon / CH | 02 /
Gonzenbach, Hans Ulrich 2, rue Liotard 1202 Geneva / CH | 03 /
Pochon, Magali 29, chemin de la Vendée 1213 Petit-Lancy, Geneva / CH | 04 /
Sidrac, Dominique Contamines Etoile, 5, avenue Louis Armand 74160 Saint-Julien, (en Genevois) / FR | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/06] | Kellenberger, Marcus, Dr., et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98114262.3 | 30.07.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | EP19970113446 | 05.08.1997 Original published format: EP 97113446 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895776 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895776 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895776 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (KR);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q17/00 (KR);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/02] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Filtrierendes Kosmetisches Mittel | [1999/06] | English: | Cosmetic light-screening composition | [1999/06] | French: | Composition cosmetique filtrante | [1999/07] |
Former [1999/06] | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE FILTRANTE | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 09.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3079366 (BOYLE RICHARD J, et al) [DX] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 30; claim 1; table IV *; | [A]FR2002888 (WARNER LAMBERT PHARMACEUTICAL) [A] 11* table I *; | [A]EP0174832 (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) [A] 11 * page 55, line 5 *; | [A]DE4122475 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,9,12 *; | [A]WO9615102 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,12 *; | [A]US5639446 (RASPANTI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * |