blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0898118

EP0898118 - Method and device for controlling a burner, especially a full premix gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Danner, Klaus
Pappelweg 6
66440 Blieskastel / DE
[1999/08]
Application number, filing date98114284.730.07.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateDE199713457409.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734574
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898118
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898118
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:F23N1/02, F23N5/02
[1999/08]
CPC:
F23N1/022 (EP); F23N5/102 (EP); F23D2208/10 (EP);
F23D2900/00012 (EP); F23N2225/16 (EP); F23N2225/30 (EP);
F23N2235/16 (EP); F23N5/02 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/17]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln eines Brenners, insbesondere eines vollvormischenden Gasbrenners[1999/08]
English:Method and device for controlling a burner, especially a full premix gas burner[1999/08]
French:Procédé et dispositif de commande d'un brûleur, notammement un brûleur à gaz prémélangé complet[1999/08]
Examination procedure09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
15.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/42]
20.05.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09196361  ;
 [A]JPS61165521  ;
 [A]CH389539  (GROOTENHUYS HENRI WILLEM [NL]) [A] 1,5,7 * figure .; claim . *;
 [A]JPH01139917  ;
 [A]EP0355953  (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09196361 A 19970729 (PALOMA IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861211), vol. 010, no. 372, Database accession no. (M - 544), & JP61165521 A 19860726 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890830), vol. 013, no. 392, Database accession no. (M - 865), & JP01139917 A 19890601 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,5,7,8 * abstract *
by applicantDE3716641
 DE3918855
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.