Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976489

EP0976489 - Solder material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Habu, Kazutaka
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Takeda, Naoko
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date98114337.330.07.1998
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976489
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23K35/26, C22C13/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Weichlötmaterial[2000/05]
English:Solder material[2000/05]
French:Matériau pour soudure tendre[2000/05]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
02.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2002Fee for grant paid
28.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
12.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH09206983  ;
 [Y]WO9217617  (US ENERGY [US]) [Y] 1,2,4 * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0612578  (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 4 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0847828  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0710521  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0639426  (NIHON ALMIT KK [JP])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SEIKI SAKUYAMA ET AL, "SOLDERABILITY OF SOLDER-COATED SURFACES FOR SMT PRINTED WIRING BOARDS", FUJITSU-SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19931221), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 357 - 366, XP000439110 [Y] 4 * page 363 - page 366 *