blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0894567

EP0894567 - Method and apparatus for measuring an eyeglass frame and eyeglass lens grinding apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi
Aichi / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizuno, Toshiaki
28-16, Nagane, Kanehira-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi / JP
[1999/05]
Representative(s)Weber, Joachim
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Weber, Joachim, Dr.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date98114475.131.07.1998
[1999/05]
Priority number, dateJP1997022080731.07.1997         Original published format: JP 22080797
[1999/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0894567
Date:03.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0894567
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0894567
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:B24B49/00, B24B9/14, B24B17/02, B24B17/10
[2000/30]
CPC:
B24B17/026 (EP,US); B24B17/10 (EP,US); B24B49/00 (EP,US);
B24B9/144 (EP,US); B24B9/148 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/05]B24B9/14, B24B17/00, B24B49/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/17]
Former [1999/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen eines Brillenlinsengestellaufbaus und Brillenlinsenschleifmaschine unter Verwendung desselben[1999/05]
English:Method and apparatus for measuring an eyeglass frame and eyeglass lens grinding apparatus using the same[1999/05]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer une monture de lunettes et machine de meulage de verres de lunettes faisant usage de ces derniers[1999/05]
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
10.02.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
30.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2004Fee for grant paid
05.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.03.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.03.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0666139  (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 3; figure 14 * [Y] 6-10;
 [Y]EP0576268  (HOYA CORP [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPS6328550  ;
 [PXL]EP0826460  (NIDEK KK [JP]) [PXL] 1,2,5-7 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880706), vol. 012, no. 236, Database accession no. (M - 715), & JP63028550 A 19880206 (TOKYO OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 8-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.