Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898085

EP0898085 - Pressurised-fluid motor for electrorheological fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fludicon GmbH
Landwehrstrasse 50
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2006/08]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Bayer Chemicals AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
For all designated states
CARL SCHENCK AG
Landwehrstrasse 55
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
For all designated states
CARL SCHENCK AG
Landwehrstrasse 55
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rosenfeldt, Horst Dr.
Blumenstrasse 35
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
02 / Adams, Dorothea
Schubertstrasse 18a
64572 Büttelborn / DE
03 / Scherk, Horst
Adam-Rückert-Strasse 41
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
04 / Wendt, Eckhardt Dr.
Dhünnstrasse 129
51373 Leverkusen / DE
05 / Büsing, Klaus
Andreas Gryphius Strasse 5
51065 Köln / DE
06 / Fees, Gerald
Schumacherstrasse 19/21
52062 Aachen / DE
 [2006/18]
Former [1999/09]01 / Rosenfeldt, Horst Dr.
Blumenstrasse 35
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
02 / Adams, Dorothea
Schubertstrasse 18a
64572 Büttelborn / DE
03 / Scherk, Horst
Adam-Rückert-Strasse 41
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
04 / Wendt, Eckhardt Dr.
Dhünnstrasse 129
51373 Leverkusen / DE
05 / Büsing, Klaus
Andreas Gryphius Strasse 5
51068 Köln / DE
06 / Fees, Gerald
Schumacherstrasse 19/21
52062 Aachen / DE
Former [1999/08]01 / Rosenfeldt, Horst Dr.
Blumenstrasse 35
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
02 / Adams, Dorothea
Schubertstrasse 18a
64572 Büttelborn / DE
03 / Scherk, Horst
Adam-Rückert-Strasse 41
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
04 / Wendt, Eckhardt Dr.
Dhünnstrasse 129
51373 Leverkusen / DE
05 / Büsing, Klaus
Humboldtstrasse 24
50676 Köln / DE
06 / Fees, Gerald
Schumacherstrasse 19/21
52062 Aachen / DE
Representative(s)Behrens, Helmut
KNPP - Knigge Nourney Völger Böhm
Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Gross-Gerauer Weg 55
64295 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]Behrens, Helmut
Gross-Gerauer Weg 55
64295 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2005/44](deleted)
...
Former [2002/05]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [1999/08]Jochum, Axel
c/o Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date98114617.804.08.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateDE1997103546616.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19735466
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898085
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898085
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0898085
Date:10.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F15B21/06
[1999/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/39]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckmittelmotor für elektrorheologische Flüssigkeiten[1999/08]
English:Pressurised-fluid motor for electrorheological fluids[1999/08]
French:Vérin à fluide à pression pour fluides électrorhéologiques[1999/08]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
02.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2006Fee for grant paid
08.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE10.08.2006
ES21.08.2006
BE31.08.2006
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
[2007/30]
Former [2006/50]SE10.08.2006
ES21.08.2006
Former [2006/49]SE10.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[DYA]US4840112  (BHADRA DILIP K [US], et al) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8;
 [Y]GB2244006  (BLATCHFORD & SONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 13; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3552275  (CHANEY HAROLD K, et al) [A] 1,3-7 * column 5, line 35 - column 8, line 49 *;
 [A]US5377721  (KIYOHIRO NORIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 45; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3587613  (MARK JOHN W, et al) [A] 1,3-6 * column 2, lines 8-22 *
by applicantUS4840112