Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901093

EP0901093 - Image acquisition apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujiwara, Minoru, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamamura R & D Center, 3-2-1, Sakae-cho
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
02 / Sasaki, Makoto, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamamura R & D Center, 3-2-1, Sakae-cho
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
03 / Ishii, Hiromitsu, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamamura R & D Center, 3-2-1, Sakae-cho
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
04 / Muto, Tetsuo, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamamura R & D Center, 3-2-1, Sakae-cho
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98114668.104.08.1998
[1999/10]
Priority number, dateJP1997022201805.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22201897
JP1997022201905.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22201997
JP1997028925107.10.1997         Original published format: JP 28925197
[1999/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901093
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901093
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/20, G06K9/00
[2000/08]
Former International [1999/10]G06K9/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Bildaufnahme[1999/10]
English:Image acquisition apparatus[1999/10]
French:Capteur d'images[1999/10]
Examination procedure04.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/10]
21.06.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5446290  (FUJIEDA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH09116128  ;
 [PX]US5708497  (FUJIEDA ICHIRO [JP]) [PX] 1-3,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0609812  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 8,9 * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]JPH01179937  ;
 [A]US5448649  (CHEN WANG S [TW], et al) [A] 8-11 * figure 5 *;
 [A]WO9714111  (KALLO PETER [HU], et al) [A] 15-17,20 * claims 1-5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, [X] 1-3,8,9,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891018), vol. 013, no. 460, Database accession no. (P - 946), [A] 4-7,18,19 * abstract *