EP0907143 - System for providing security information disposed on an article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meto International GmbH Ersheimer Strasse 69 69434 Hirschhorn/Neckar / DE | [1999/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rührig, Manfred, Dr. Karlsberg 7 69469 Weinheim / DE | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Erhardtstrasse 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Erhardtstrasse 12 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114680.6 | 05.08.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | DE1997143829 | 04.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19743829 | [1999/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907143 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907143 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907143 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/10 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G06K19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Bereitstellung von fälschungssicherer Information über einen Artikel | [1999/14] | English: | System for providing security information disposed on an article | [1999/14] | French: | Système pour l'obtention d'information sécurisée placée sur un article | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.12.2005 | IE | 07.12.2005 | DK | 07.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | AT | 05.08.2006 | LU | 05.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/12] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
DK | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2177768 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * claims 3,6,10 *; | [X]FR2360943 (NCR CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * claims 3,4 *; | [X]FR2711825 (BANCOURT ERIC [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE29611156U (HERM WECK SOHN VERPACKUNGS UND [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,10 * page 2, line 4 - line 8 ** claims 1,5 * |