Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899771

EP0899771 - Energy filter, particularly for electron microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.09.2005  [2005/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss NTS GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 56
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2004/49]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
LEO Elektronenmikroskopie GmbH
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Benner, Gerd, Dr.
Milanweg 95
73434 Aalen / DE
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Gnatzig, Klaus , et al
Carl Zeiss
Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Gnatzig, Klaus , et al
Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Application number, filing date98114706.905.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateDE199713807001.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19738070
[1999/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899771
Date:03.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899771
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0899771
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/05
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2001/37]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Energiefilter, insbesondere für ein Elektronenmikroskop[1999/09]
English:Energy filter, particularly for electron microscope[1999/09]
French:Filtre en énergie, en particulier pour microscope électronique[1999/09]
Examination procedure13.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2004Fee for grant paid
19.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4740704  (ROSE HARALD [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [AD]DE3423149  (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 16, lines 3-5; figure 4 *
ExaminationEP0352552