EP0971019 - Method of cleaning dishes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab GmbH & Co. OHG Reisholzer Werftstrasse 38-40 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Ecolab GmbH & CO. OHG Reisholzer Werftstrasse 38-40 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states HENKEL-ECOLAB GmbH & CO. OHG Reisholzer Werftstrasse 38-42 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwitzer, Walter Baselstrasse 101 4144 Arlesheim / CH | 02 /
Ruedi, Michel Sandstrasse 5 8716 Schmerikon / CH | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/02] | Hase, Christian, Dr., et al c/o Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien, Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114776.2 | 06.08.1998 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | DE19981024356 | 30.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19824356 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971019 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971019 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/90, C11D1/10, C11D3/395 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C11D3/3947 (EP);
C11D1/90 (EP);
C11D2111/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Geschirr | [2000/02] | English: | Method of cleaning dishes | [2000/02] | French: | Procédé pour le nettoyage de la vaisselle | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 08.12.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.) Mühlenhagen 85 D-20539 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Keussen, Christof Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | 02
28.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.) Mühlenhagen 85 D-20539 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Keussen, Christof, Dr. Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
28.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | 09.01.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.02.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0892597 ; | [A]EP0670364 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 10 - line 22 * * examples 1,2 *; | [A]WO9731092 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 21, line 27 - line 35 * * claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO9731093 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 19, line 31 - line 35 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0805198 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0835925 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 12 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 24, Database accession no. 96-236363, XP002084474 & JPH0892597 A 19960409 (KAO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |