Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896149

EP0896149 - Fuel combustion control system for engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima-ken / JP
[2006/02]
Former [1999/06]For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishimura, Hirofumi
15-9, Kuchitaminami, 9-chome Asakita-ku
Hiroshima-ku, Hiroshima / JP
02 / Taga, Junichi
1032-1-C302, Miyaryo, Takaya-cho
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
03 / Ishihara, Takahisa
3248-128, Kodani, Takaya-cho
Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
04 / Nishimura, Eiji
14-20, Yanominami, 1-chome Aki-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
[1999/06]
Representative(s)Gossel, Hans K. , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/06]Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98114818.206.08.1998
[1999/06]
Priority number, dateJP1997021167206.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21167297
JP1998019733713.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19733798
[1999/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0896149
Date:10.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0896149
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0896149
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02P5/15, F02D41/02
[2002/39]
Former International [1999/06]F02P5/15
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/24]
Former [1999/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerung für die Brennstoffverbrennung von Brennkraftmaschinen[1999/06]
English:Fuel combustion control system for engine[1999/06]
French:Commande de la combustion de carburant pour moteur à combustion[1999/06]
Examination procedure21.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
26.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, IT
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2005Fee for grant paid
02.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.05.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.01.2006
GB06.08.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/12]GB06.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5652380  (MACHIDA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,5,9,11-14,21 * figures 5-9 * * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 42 - column 8, line 28 * * column 9, line 15 - column 10, line 16 * [Y] 2,17;
 [X]JPH0814109  ;
 [YA]WO9417293  (ORBITAL ENG PTY [AU], et al) [Y] 2,17 * page 1, line 1 - line 23 * * page 2, line 9 - line 15 * * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 1 - line 14 * * figure - * [A] 1,4,5,10,11,16,21;
 [A]JPH0526138  ;
 [A]JPS55161937  ;
 [A]JPH03260374  ;
 [A]JPH05106498
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, [X] 1,11,12,21 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930611), vol. 017, no. 306, Database accession no. (M - 1428), [A] 1,2,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810310), vol. 005, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 058), [A] 1-3,10-13,16,17,21 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920221), vol. 016, no. 072, Database accession no. (M - 1213), [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930825), vol. 017, no. 465, Database accession no. (M - 1468), [A] 1,6,8,11,21 * abstract *