Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979017

EP0979017 - Method for channel allocation and radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Benz, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Schuckertdamm 328
13629 Berlin / DE
02 / Li, Wanlin, Dr. rer. nat.
Quellweg 13
13629 Berlin / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date98114943.807.08.1998
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979017
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kanalzuweisung und Funk-Kommunikationssystem[2000/06]
English:Method for channel allocation and radio communication system[2000/06]
French:Méthode d'allocation de canaux et système de radiocommunication[2000/06]
Examination procedure03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
01.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
16.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5260944  (TOMABECHI AKITAKA [JP]) [A] 1,7,10,14 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 41 * * column 17, line 40 - line 68 *;
 [A]  CHUANG J C -I, "PERFORMANCE ISSUES AND ALGORITHMS FOR DYNAMIC CHANNEL ASSIGNMENT", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19930801), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 955 - 963, XP000404003 [A] 1,9 * page 961, column L, line 14 - page 962, column L, line 11 * * page 962, column R, line 19 - line 25 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.232306