Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0898148

EP0898148 - Method for the determination of the road surface condition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Griesinger, Manfred, Dr.
Fichtestrasse 4
71229 Leonberg / DE
[1999/08]
Application number, filing date98114954.508.08.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateDE199713613820.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19736138
EP1998010336526.02.1998         Original published format: EP 98103365
[1999/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898148
Date:24.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898148
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/06, B60T8/00, G01N21/35, G01N21/55
[2000/17]
Former International [1999/08]G01B11/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [1999/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Zustands einer Fahrbahnoberfläche[1999/08]
English:Method for the determination of the road surface condition[1999/08]
French:Procédé pour la détermination de la condition de la surface d' une chaussée[1999/08]
Examination procedure18.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19506550  (INST CHEMO BIOSENSORIK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5218206  (SCHMITT KLEMENS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *