Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901203

EP0901203 - Resiliently mounted lamp socket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vossloh Schwabe GmbH
Gartenstrasse 14
D-58511 Lüdenscheid / DE
[1999/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Mews, Hans-Peter
Scharnhorststrasse 41
58511 Lüdenscheid / DE
02 / Selve, Ulf
Hohfuhrstrasse 54
58509 Lüdenscheid / DE
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Rüger Abel
Patentanwälte
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Webergasse 3
73728 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date98114957.808.08.1998
[1999/10]
Priority number, dateDE199713846103.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19738461
[1999/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901203
Date:10.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901203
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0901203
Date:20.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R33/975, H01R33/09, H01R13/74, H01R33/08
[2000/42]
Former International [1999/10]H01R33/975, H01R33/09, H01R13/74
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/27]
Former [1999/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Federnd gelagerte Lampenfassung[1999/10]
English:Resiliently mounted lamp socket[1999/10]
French:Douille de lampe montée de façon élastique[1999/10]
Examination procedure21.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
19.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, IE, LU, MC
27.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2002Fee for grant paid
29.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE2214925  (MELLERT FA HERMANN) [Y] 1-3,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 4-9;
 [Y]EP0621661  (VOSSLOH SCHWABE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,10-13 * page 7, column 12, line 4 - page 8, column 13, line 40; figures 6-9 *;
 [PY]US5758952  (GETSELIS ARKADY [US], et al) [PY] 10,11 * column 6, line 15 - line 35; figures 10,11 *;
 [A]US3701081  (JAYNE MAX L, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 4 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE1915096  (BROEKELMANN JAEGER & BUSSE) [A] 1,12,13 * page 1, line 6 - page 8, line 17; figures 7,8 *