Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903349

EP0903349 - CCR-3 receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
4070 Basel / CH
[2006/01]
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Gong, Leyi
2259 Armada Way
San Mateo, California 94404 / US
02 / Kertesz, Denis John
459 Victory Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
03 / Smith, David Bernard
218 West 40th Avenue
San Mateo, California 94403 / US
04 / Talamas, Francisco Xavier
1369 Geneva Street
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
05 / Wilhelm, Robert Stephen
90 Hillview Avenue
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Braun, Axel , et al
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Patent Department (PLP)
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]Braun, Axel , et al
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98114971.910.08.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateUS19970056001P18.08.1997         Original published format: US 56001 P
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903349
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903349
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0903349
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D295/12, C07D207/09, C07D207/20, C07D209/42, C07D211/16, C07D211/18, C07D213/81, C07D215/48, C07D215/54, C07D307/68, C07D333/38, C07D333/68, C07D307/84, C07D317/68, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D333/34, A61K31/445, A61K31/495
[2000/22]
Former International [1999/12]C07D295/12, C07D207/09, C07D207/20, C07D209/42, C07D211/16, C07D211/18, C07D213/81, C07D215/48, C07D215/54, C07D307/68, C07D307/84, C07D317/68, C07D333/34, C07D333/38, C07D333/68, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, A61K31/445, A61K31/495
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/12]
Extension statesLT10.08.1998
LV10.08.1998
RO10.08.1998
SI10.08.1998
TitleGerman:CCR-3-Rezeptor-Antagonisten[1999/12]
English:CCR-3 receptor antagonists[1999/12]
French:Antagonistes du récepteur CCR-3[1999/12]
Examination procedure24.09.1999Examination requested  [2001/02]
30.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2005Fee for grant paid
29.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
CY04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
IE10.08.2006
LU10.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
IE10.08.2006
LU10.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/21]AT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
GR05.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
IE10.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2008/12]AT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
IE10.08.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/21]AT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
MC31.08.2006
Former [2007/17]AT04.01.2006
BE04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2007/01]AT04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
DK04.04.2006
SE04.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2006/49]AT04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
SE04.04.2006
PT05.06.2006
Former [2006/45]AT04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
NL04.01.2006
SE04.04.2006
Former [2006/43]AT04.01.2006
FI04.01.2006
Former [2006/36]FI04.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0395313  (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US], et al) [A] 1,73 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0311517  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,73 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0217286  (OKAMOTO SHOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,73 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS63275576  ;
 [A]JPS63264525
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890309), vol. 13, no. 101, Database accession no. (C - 574), [A] 1,73 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890217), vol. 13, no. 72, Database accession no. (C - 570), [A] 1,73 * abstract *
ExaminationUS4579947
 WO9719060
 WO9628424
 JPH0283375