Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0896895

EP0896895 - Drive force control device for a vehicle equipped with an antilock brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.11.2002  [2002/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Adachi, Kazutaka
402, Imperial Bayview, 3-21, Aoki-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama city, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Itou, Ken
33-13, Midoriyama 2-chome, Miwa
Machida City, Tokyo / JP
[1999/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98115088.111.08.1998
[1999/07]
Priority number, dateJP1997021774112.08.1997         Original published format: JP 21774197
[1999/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0896895
Date:17.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0896895
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0896895
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60K28/16, B60T8/00, B60K41/14, B60K41/28, B60K41/26
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/07]B60K28/16, B60T8/00, B60K41/14, B60K41/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Traktionssteuerungseinrichtung für Fahrzeug mit blockiergeschützter Bremsanlage[1999/07]
English:Drive force control device for a vehicle equipped with an antilock brake system[1999/07]
French:Système anti-patinage pour véicules avec installation de freinage à antiblocage[2001/48]
Former [1999/07]Système anti-patinage pour vehicules avec installation de freinage à antiblocage
Examination procedure11.08.1998Examination requested  [1999/07]
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2001Fee for grant paid
19.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5109962  (SATO KEIJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 27 - line 62 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0373865  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 35 *;
 [A]US5435795  (MOCHIZUKI NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2263519  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [DA]JPH0379851
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910625), vol. 015, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 1128), [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0379851