Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899715

EP0899715 - method of operating a multimedia apparatus including a television set and a personal computer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MMT Licence AG i.Gr.
Beethovenstrasse 8-10
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2002/09]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
MMS Multi Media Systems AG
Altkönigstrasse 4
61138 Niederdorfelden/Frankfurt / DE
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
Metec MultiMedia Technik GmbH & Co. KG
Descostrasse 4a
76307 Karlsbad / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kauselmann, Rainer
Kopernikusstrasse 33
75203 Köngisbach-Stein / DE
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Frank, Gerhard , et al
Patentanwälte
Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt
Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Former [2001/39](deleted)
...
Former [1999/22]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/09]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98115769.621.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateDE199713711527.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19737115
[1999/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899715
Date:03.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899715
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/00, G06F3/14
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben eines ein Fernsehgerät und einen Personalcomputer aufweisenden Mediengeräts[1999/09]
English:method of operating a multimedia apparatus including a television set and a personal computer[1999/09]
French:procédé de commande d'un appareil multimédia comprenant un appareil de télévision et un ordinateur[1999/09]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
07.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, MC
02.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
07.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200104   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2002
31.08.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0569311  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4,7-13,16-18,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 39 * * column 4, line 12 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5,6,14,15,19;
 [XA]WO9718669  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,12-15,17,19 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - line 29 * * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 16 * * page 7, line 13 - line 26 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5-11,16,18,20;
 [XA]WO9729591  (WOLZIEN THOMAS R [US]) [X] 1,12-17,19,20 * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 19 - page 17, line 28 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-11,18;
 [XA]US5537151  (ORR STEPHEN J [CA], et al) [X] 1,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 35 - column 7, line 22 * * figures 2-6 * [A] ;
 [X]WO9722207  (FRIDLEY TECHN LTD, et al) [X] 1,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9712486  (BOSTON TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 29 * * page 6, line 3 - page 16, line 23 * * figures 1,2 *