Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0909677

EP0909677 - Upholstery for vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Faust, Eberhard
Zedernweg 15
70597 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Pfahler, Karl, Dr.
Mühlrain 22
70180 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/16]
Application number, filing date98115887.622.08.1998
[1999/16]
Priority number, dateDE199714552115.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19745521
[1999/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0909677
Date:21.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0909677
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/44
[1999/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
Former [1999/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polster für einen Fahrzeugsitz[1999/16]
English:Upholstery for vehicle seat[1999/16]
French:Capitonnage pour siège de véhicule[1999/16]
Examination procedure04.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/16]
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2003Fee for grant paid
22.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5016302  (YU KAUNG M [US]) [X] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, line 36 - line 67; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4,6;
 [XA]DE3903303  (WUNDERATZKE WILFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-6;
 [A]WO9709908  (WALINOV AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE19628698  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *