EP0903712 - Display system for vehicle to display the extent of range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bigalke, Manfred Johann-Strauss-Strasse 24 85591 Vaterstetten / DE | [1999/12] | Application number, filing date | 98116073.2 | 26.08.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | DE1997141316 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741316 | [1999/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903712 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903712 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0968 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
G08G1/096844 (EP,US);
G01C21/3697 (EP);
G01F9/001 (EP);
G08G1/0969 (EP);
B60L2240/622 (EP);
B60L2250/16 (EP);
B60L2260/52 (EP);
B60L2260/54 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/45] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung für Fahrzeuge zur Anzeige der Reichweite | [1999/12] | English: | Display system for vehicle to display the extent of range | [1999/12] | French: | Système d'affichage pour véhicule indiquant la distance franchissable | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5428544 (SHYU JIA-MING [TW]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, lines 39-4-11 *; | [A]US5642107 (CROSS MARILYN [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 30-36 *; | [DA]DE19516649 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 2 * column 1, lines 39-44 * |