Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899053

EP0899053 - A plated product and a method and apparatus for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SINTOKOGIO LTD.
7-23, 4-chome, Meieki Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
SINTOKOGIO LTD.
7-23, 4-chome, Meieki
Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ota, Kunio
26-6, Kusama-cho, Higashiyama
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP
02 / Rokutanda, Hitoshi
3-123, Suwa
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP
03 / Suzuki, Hiroaki
63, Tameto-cho, Ichigi
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP
04 / Kato, Shinobu
4-1-76, Tokugawayama-cho, Chikusa-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP
05 / Abe, Seietsu
36-6, Hirao-cho Rokkoji
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Behrens, Dieter
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98116098.926.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateJP1997025001129.08.1997         Original published format: JP 25001197
JP1997029335409.10.1997         Original published format: JP 29335497
JP1998013182414.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13182498
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899053
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899053
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23P11/00, C23C16/02
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/50]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Plattiertes Produkt und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung[1999/09]
English:A plated product and a method and apparatus for producing the same[1999/09]
French:Produit plaqué et procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication[1999/09]
Examination procedure19.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
17.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
03.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9633837  (DAETWYLER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7-9,11,14,15,17 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4023613  (UEBAYASI YOSITAKA, et al) [A] 1,3,5,7-9,11,14,15,17 * column 4, line 43 - line 61; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JPH04280953  ;
 [A]JPH06177511  ;
 [A]JPS60230975  ;
 [A]JPH0544012
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930217), vol. 017, no. 079, Database accession no. (C - 1027), [A] 1,2,7,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940926), vol. 018, no. 509, Database accession no. (E - 1610), [A] 1,2,7,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860415), vol. 010, no. 098, Database accession no. (C - 339), [A] 1,2,7,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930630), vol. 017, no. 345, Database accession no. (C - 1077), [A] 1,2,7,11 * abstract *